+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (59)
On March 25, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 762 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2147ER)
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (37-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 22, 1997 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (3-Y 94-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (3-Y 94-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Delegates: Katzen, Cranwell, Phillips
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Quayle, Houck, Newman
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 979172316-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 979172316-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 979172316-S1
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 21-N)
- Read third time and passed House (76-Y 21-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Mr. Katzen agreed to
- Read second time
- Motion to refer to committee rejected
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as reengrossed 973464316-E
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Amendments by Mr. Hull agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 973464316-E
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 973464316
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 22, 1997: VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (37-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (3-Y 94-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1997: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 21-N)
January 24, 1997: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor