+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 17, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
On April 11, 1995 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2147ER)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 754 (effective 7/1/95)
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2147ER)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Floor amendent withdrawn (Woods)
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
- Reading of amendment waived
- Floor amendent offered (Woods)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD7195188-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed LD7195188
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (38-Y 0-N)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor