+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 8, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2140ER)
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 848 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2140ER)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 978200819
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1997: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor