+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Education
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101433D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor