+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 385 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2137ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2137H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104734D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104734D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101351D