+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N)
- Read third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N)
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 21101625D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2137E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 8-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101625D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2021: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N)
February 1, 2021: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
February 1, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
January 28, 2021: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 8-N)
January 26, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
January 26, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor