+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 28, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526)
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 526 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2136ER)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 5-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (92-Y 5-N)
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 4-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD6689204-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD6689204-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD6689204-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed LD4385204
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 5-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 4-N)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1995: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor