+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 198 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2132ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 092088640-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2132H1
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 092088640-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: 1
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 098478640
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 25, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
February 20, 2009: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor