+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 317 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2132ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
- Floor substitute printed 079441332-H1 (Wardrup)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Substitute by Delegate Wardrup withdrawn 079441332-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Transportation (18-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1 (Welch)
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078273332