+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 28, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
On March 23, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 524 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2131ER)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed LD4114244
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1995: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor