+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1154)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1154 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB213ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N)
- Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
On December 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101656D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
February 20, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N)
February 4, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Richard C. "Rip" Sullivan, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor