+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass in Senate
- No further action taken
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 19107303D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19107303D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 16-N)
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 16-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2127H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105450D-H1
- Read second time
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19105450D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104127D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
January 31, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 16-N)
January 25, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor