+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 3, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668)
On March 25, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 668 (effective 7/1/95)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 14, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2126ER)
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed LD1365430
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1995: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor