+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 337 (effective 1/1/20)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2126ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment rejected
- Finance Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2126H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106082D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106082D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 1-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102027D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (9)
February 21, 2019: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2019: Finance Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor