+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
- Read third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 21100907D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2125E
- Pending question ordered
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Voting Rights
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100907D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
January 27, 2021: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
January 20, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor