+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 17, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0230)
On March 14, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 230 (effective 7/1/95)
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2123ER)
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD6096232-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (20-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD6096232
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1995: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from General Laws with amds. (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor