+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0947)
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 947 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2122ER)
On February 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 13-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (84-Y 13-N)
- Conference substitute printed 039112904-H1
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Stolle, Trumbo, Saslaw
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Delegates: Reid, Hamilton, Bland
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 86-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (5-Y 86-N)
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 039100540-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 039100540-S1
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 039100540-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N)
- Read third time and passed House (86-Y 12-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 2-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 033933904
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
February 22, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 13-N)
February 22, 2003: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 86-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N)
January 27, 2003: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor