+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 16, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 441 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2120ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendments by Senator Barker agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments rejected
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (11-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2120H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104619D-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104619D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102046D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (11-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor