+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2120H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103246D-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 21103246D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102195D