+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 8, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0846)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 846 (effective 7/1/97)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2119ER)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2119ER)
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 972364833
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor