+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 568 (effective 7/1/15)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2114ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 5-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 12-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Martin, Carrico, Lewis
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Delegates: Bell, Richard P., Rust, Keam
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 88-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by House (2-Y 88-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 17-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100833D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
February 25, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 12-N)
February 25, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N)
February 25, 2015: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 5-N)
February 20, 2015: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 88-N)
February 16, 2015: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 17-N 1-A)
February 13, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
February 5, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
February 2, 2015: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor