+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 424 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB211ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105324D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB211H1
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105324D-H1
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #3
On December 29, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100685D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources