+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 282 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2105ER)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 978019805
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1997: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 20, 1997: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor