+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 446 (effective 7/1/21)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2105ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102419D