+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Engrossment (42-Y 52-N)
- Engrossment refused by House (42-Y 52-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100660D