+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0405)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 405 (effective - see bill)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB210ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105639D-S1 (83-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB210S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105639D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 12105639D-S1
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB210H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105248D-H1
- Passed by temporarily
- Read second time
On February 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12105248D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102594D
+ − Votes (7)
February 29, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2012: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2012: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2012: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor