+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18105168D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 7-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On December 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102869D
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 7-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor