+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 150 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB21ER)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N)
- Read first time
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/18/97 982062168
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor