+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2098ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15100964D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2098E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100964D