+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 973348308-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 2
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 973348308
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 1, 1997: Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor