+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0112)
On March 13, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 112 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2098ER)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 013962600-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amd (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 013962600
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2001: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amd (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor