+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0540)
On March 27, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 540 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2096ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 993806466