+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Finance (10-Y 4-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 053059332-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2092E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds (21-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #2
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053059332
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 15, 2005: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (10-Y 4-N)
February 3, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2005: Reported from Finance with amds (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor