+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 1, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 47 (effective 2/28/95)
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2091ER)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause LD9732176
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1995: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor