+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 749 (effective 3/23/07)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2090ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government and Technology (Wardrup)
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/07 071981524
+ − Votes (7)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2007: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor