+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 249 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2090ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100932D
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor