+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 76 (effective 3/13/98)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB209ER)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause 984426352
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor