+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB209ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB209H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105360D-H1
- Read second time
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22105360D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101695D