+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- House sustained Governor's veto
- VOTE: VETO OVERRIDE (54-Y 45-N)
- Motion to override Governor's veto rejected (54-Y 45-N)
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2089ER)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (12-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD3638260-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD3638260
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 5, 1995: VOTE: VETO OVERRIDE (54-Y 45-N)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1995: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor