+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 482 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2089ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 11105622D-H1
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senators: Reynolds, Herring, Quayle
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Delegates: Herring, Gilbert, Bell, R.B.
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 89-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (4-Y 89-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 11102348D-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2089E
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102348D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
February 25, 2011: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2011: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2011: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2011: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 89-N)
February 16, 2011: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor