+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0229)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 229 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2088ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2088H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104270D-H1
- Read second time
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104270D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101292D
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2013: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor