+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101664D