+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (63)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0860)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 860 (effective 7/1/07)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2084ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 2-N)
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2084ER)
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 24, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Conference substitute printed 073577352-H2
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senators: O'Brien, Rerras, McDougle
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Delegates: Eisenberg, Welch, Joannou
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (41-Y 57-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 57-N)
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2084S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 079446352-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 079446352-S1
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 4-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB2084H1
- Substitute by Delegate Joannou agreed to 073568352-H1
- Floor substitute printed 073568352-H1 (Joannou)
- Read second time
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (19-Y 1-N)
On January 12, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #3 (Carrico)
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 077570301