+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 228 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2083ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 13101498D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2083E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101498D