+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 583 (effective - see bill)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2079ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate amendments rejected by House (2-Y 93-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 93-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Stuart, Reeves, Petersen
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Delegates: Jones, Iaquinto, Ward
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Herring agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2079E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 13103624D-E
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Referred from Transportation by voice vote
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103624D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
February 23, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N)
February 23, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2013: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 93-N)
February 20, 2013: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor