+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101748D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2015: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor