+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 30, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
On March 21, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 457 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2078ER)
On February 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (32-Y 8-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N)
On February 26, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 13-N 1-A)
- Conference report agreed to by House (82-Y 13-N 1-A)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Delegates: Plum, Janis, McDougle
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senators: Whipple, Hanger, Reynolds
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 94-N 1-A)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (3-Y 94-N 1-A)
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (29-Y 9-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Rereferred from A.C.&N.R. (13-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (86-Y 10-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N 1-A)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2078H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 055501464-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 055501464-H1
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (20-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 058926528
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
February 26, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 13-N 1-A)
February 26, 2005: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (32-Y 8-N)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 94-N 1-A)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (29-Y 9-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: Rereferred from A.C.&N.R. (13-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N 1-A)
February 3, 2005: Reported from Appropriations with sub (20-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor