+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2073ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 8-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 2-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103403D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2013: Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 8-N)
February 19, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 2-N)
January 23, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2013: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor