+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2072ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102296D