+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1201)
- Enacted, Chapter 1201 (effective - see bill)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB207ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: (52-Y 43-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (52-Y 43-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB207ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 41-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (55-Y 41-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (22-Y 18-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N)
- Read third time and passed House (53-Y 46-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 20102060D-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB207E
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 9-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
On December 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102060D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (11)
April 22, 2020: VOTE: (52-Y 43-N)
April 22, 2020: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 41-N)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (22-Y 18-N)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N)
February 24, 2020: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N)
January 30, 2020: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N)
January 24, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 9-N)
January 21, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Schuyler T. VanValkenburg
Type:
Primary Sponsor